Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Guillaume Marque, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1882BornGardères, France
2 Apr 190724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Dec 192947.1AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
11 Feb 193047.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
4 Jun 193754.5DiedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Guillaume Marque:
Archbishop Pierre-Guillaume Marque O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Colombo

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013