Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolph Gregory Schmitt, C.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bulawayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1905BornRimpar, Germany
19 Mar 193125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
23 Dec 195045.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
23 Dec 195045.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
2 Apr 195145.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
1 Jan 195549.6AppointedBishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
9 May 197469.0ResignedBishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
5 Dec 197671.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Adolph Gregory Schmitt:
Bishop Adolph Gregory Schmitt C.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bulawayo

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015