Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Alejandro Montini

Auxiliary Bishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

Titular Bishop of Tisedi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1970 BornRaquel
15 Mar 199625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rafaela, Argentina
14 Feb 201443.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña, Argentina
14 Feb 201443.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
1 May 201443.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisedi

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Alejandro Montini:
Bishop Gustavo Alejandro Montini (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Roque de Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 14 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Aug 2014