Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos María Franzini

Deceased

Archbishop of Mendoza, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1951Born
13 Aug 197725.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
29 Apr 200048.6AppointedBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
19 Jun 200048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
10 Nov 201261.1AppointedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
9 Feb 201361.4InstalledArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
8 Dec 201766.2DiedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Franzini
Archbishop Carlos María Franzini (born , died ) Archbishop of Mendoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires
Ordained BishopIn front of, San Rafael, Cathedral, Rafaela, Diocese of Rafaela
Death PlaceMendoza, Archdiocese of Mendoza

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,788
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2012
  • i: CB, 19 Nov 2012
  • d: CB, 8 Dec 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast