Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Adolfo Larregain, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Corrientes, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Mauriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1966 Born
19 Mar 199427.9EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 199629.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Aug 200034.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
2003²36.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor
19 Mar 200437.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Mar 202053.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Corrientes, Argentina
21 Mar 202053.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauriana
29 Jun 202054.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauriana

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Adolfo Larregain
Bishop José Adolfo Larregain O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Corrientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdolfo Gonzáles Cháves, Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Corrientes, Archdiocese of Corrientes

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Corrientes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2020
  • prof: CB, 21 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 26 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jun 2020

Quantcast