Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Monari

Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1942 Born
20 Jun 196523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Reggio Emilia, Italy
23 Jun 199553.2AppointedBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
2 Sep 199553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
3 Sep 199553.4InstalledBishop of Piacenza-Bobbio, Italy
19 Jul 200765.3AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
14 Oct 200765.5InstalledBishop of Brescia, Italy
12 Jul 201775.2RetiredBishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Monari (VIAF: 98064342)
Bishop Luciano Monari (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassuolo
Ordained BishopPalazzo dello sport "Giulio Bigi", Reggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia-Guastalla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brescia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,603
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast