Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bresciani

Bishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1949 Born
7 Jun 197526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
4 Nov 201364.6AppointedBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy
11 Jan 201464.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy
19 Jan 201464.8InstalledBishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bresciani
Bishop Carlo Bresciani (born ) Bishop of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNave

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Benedetto del Tronto-Ripatransone-Montalto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 5 Nov 2013
  • c12: CB, 24 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast