Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Ferrando

Bishop of Bragança do Pará, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1941 BornAgazzano, Italy
1 May 196524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Piacenza, Italy
10 Apr 199655.2AppointedBishop of Bragança do Pará, Para, Brazil
5 May 199655.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança do Pará, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ferrando:
Bishop Luigi Ferrando (born ) Bishop of Bragança do Pará

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bragança do Pará.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,747

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013