Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Menamparampil, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Guwahati

Apostolic Administrator of Jowai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1936 BornPalai
2 May 196528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Jun 198144.7AppointedBishop of Dibrugarh, India
29 Nov 198145.1Ordained BishopBishop of Dibrugarh, India
30 Mar 199255.4AppointedBishop of Guwahati, India
10 Jul 199558.7AppointedArchbishop of Guwahati, India
18 Jan 201275.2RetiredArchbishop of Guwahati, India
3 Feb 201477.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jowai, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Menamparampil:
Archbishop Thomas Menamparampil S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guwahati

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Guwahati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014