Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert D’Rosario, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Shillong


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1919BornCalicut
16 Apr 194728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
6 Jul 196445.3AppointedBishop of Dibrugarh, India
6 Sep 196445.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dibrugarh, India
26 Jun 196950.3AppointedArchbishop of Gauhati-Shillong, India
30 Aug 199475.5DiedArchbishop of Shillong, India

MicroData Summary for Hubert D’Rosario:
Archbishop Hubert D’Rosario S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Shillong

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015