Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Shillong

Archidioecesis Shillongensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Dominic Jala, S.D.B., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Split: 30 March 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 5,196 (2,006 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.shillongarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Shillong-793003, Meghalaya, India
  • Telephone: (0364)22.33.55

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Assam
13 December 1889ErectedDiocese of Krishnagar Prefecture Apostolic of Assam (erected)
Diocese of Shillong
9 July 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Assam Diocese of Shillong
12 July 1951Territory LostDiocese of Shillong Diocese of Dibrugarh (erected)
16 January 1964Territory LostDiocese of Dibrugarh
Diocese of Shillong
Diocese of Tezpur (erected)
Archdiocese of Gauhati-Shillong
26 June 1969ElevatedDiocese of Shillong Archdiocese of Gauhati-Shillong
Archdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati
22 January 1970Name ChangedArchdiocese of Gauhati-Shillong Archdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati
1 March 1973Territory LostArchdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati Diocese of Tura (erected)
5 December 1983Territory LostArchdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati Diocese of Diphu (erected)
30 March 1992Territory LostArchdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati
Diocese of Tezpur
Diocese of Tura
Diocese of Guwahati (erected)
Archdiocese of Shillong
30 March 1992SplitArchdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati Archdiocese of Shillong
28 January 2006Territory LostArchdiocese of Shillong Diocese of Nongstoin (erected)
28 January 2006Territory LostArchdiocese of Shillong Diocese of Jowai (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Shillong
195084,5867,100,0001.2%55551,5375310417ap1951
Archdiocese of Gauhati-Shillong
Archdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati
1970122,1692,500,0004.9%1269811,50815522719ap1971
1980138,0771,884,3447.3%25851101,25524331829ap1981
1990218,9202,728,3648.0%381041421,54122041229ap1991
Archdiocese of Shillong
1999323,4141,329,20424.3%55941492,17024747133ap2000
2000335,0661,357,11824.7%55951502,23325145436ap2001
2001351,2131,443,59624.3%55951502,34122045437ap2002
2002364,9601,493,74624.4%531081612,26631846138ap2003
2003380,9951,555,34624.5%541101642,32333347941ap2004
2004386,7581,668,30623.2%551141692,28829050444ap2005
2005364,9601,493,74624.4%551081632,2393745438bul30Jan2006
2006230,150886,79426.0%41871281,7983235322bul30Jan2006
2010271,0001,093,00024.8%521001521,78239644231ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013