Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Mukala

Bishop Emeritus of Kohima, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1948 Born
10 Apr 197829.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 199749.1AppointedBishop of Kohima, India
15 Mar 199849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kohima, India
30 Oct 200961.1ResignedBishop of Kohima, India

MicroData Summary for Jose Mukala
Bishop Jose Mukala (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kohima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaveekunnu
Ordained BishopMary Help of Christians, Cathedral, Kohima, Diocese of Kohima

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kohima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast