Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Pulloppillil

Bishop of Bongaigaon, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1954 Born
6 Apr 198126.7Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 200045.8AppointedBishop of Bongaigaon, India
20 Aug 200046.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bongaigaon, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Pulloppillil (VIAF: 21465820)
Bishop Thomas Pulloppillil (born ) Bishop of Bongaigaon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNadukani

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bongaigaon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,821

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast