Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Aind, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Dibrugarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1945 Born
27 Nov 197631.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
11 Nov 199449.0AppointedBishop of Dibrugarh, India
19 Mar 199549.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dibrugarh, India
15 Feb 202175.2RetiredBishop of Dibrugarh, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Aind
Bishop Joseph Aind S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Dibrugarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNahorani
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Near, Cathedral, Dibrugarh, Diocese of Dibrugarh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dibrugarh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,536
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast