Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dennis Panipitchai, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Miao, India

Titular Bishop of Aggersel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1958 Born
27 Dec 199133.4Solemn VowsPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Dec 199133.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Jun 201859.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miao, India
8 Jun 201859.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aggersel
2 Aug 201860.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aggersel

MicroData Summary for Dennis Panipitchai
Bishop Dennis Panipitchai S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Miao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColachel, Diocese of Kottar
Ordained BishopMary Help of Christians, Church, Borduria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 8 Jun 2018
  • c2+: CB, 2 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast