Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Jean-Gabriel Maurice, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale}

Titular Bishop of Lesvi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1862BornLa Plaine, France
187916.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
5 Sep 188522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1 Aug 190845.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
1 Aug 190845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
30 Nov 190846.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
12 Apr 191148.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale}, China
14 Feb 191653.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale}, China
27 Jul 192562.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale}, China

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Jean-Gabriel Maurice:
Bishop Auguste-Jean-Gabriel Maurice O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale}

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 70
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013