Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yan’an [Yenan]

Dioecesis Iennganensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Ch'iao Le-Kow, Yan'an, Shaanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi)
3 February 1844ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}
6 July 1887SplitVicariate Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shensi {Scen-Si Meridionale}
12 April 1911Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Central Shensi/Chensi {Scen-Si Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Yenanfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Yenanfu
Diocese of Yan’an [Yenan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yenanfu Diocese of Yan’an [Yenan]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013