Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adéodat-Jean-Roch Wittner, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chefoo, China

Titular Bishop of Miletus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1868Born
188617.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
28 Aug 189223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
29 Apr 190738.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale}, China
29 Apr 190738.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletus
7 Jul 190738.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletus
9 Sep 191142.8SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Shantung {Scian-Ton Orientale}, China
1 Dec 193668.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Chefoo, China

MicroData Summary for Adéodat-Jean-Roch Wittner
Bishop Adéodat-Jean-Roch Wittner O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chefoo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Marie-aux-Mines, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceChefoo, Vicariate Apostolic of Chefoo

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 37
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast