Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hans-Josef Becker

Archbishop of Paderborn


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1948 BornWarstein-Belecke
11 Jun 197729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
9 Dec 199951.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
9 Dec 199951.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
23 Jan 200051.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina
3 Jul 200355.1AppointedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Sep 200355.3InstalledArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hans-Josef Becker:
Archbishop Hans-Josef Becker (born ) Archbishop of Paderborn

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Paderborn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,687
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014