Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Oster, S.D.B.

Bishop of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1965 BornAmberg
24 Jul 199934.1Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
24 Jun 200136.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Apr 201448.8AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
24 May 201449.0Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stefan Oster:
Bishop Stefan Oster S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Passau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Passau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 4 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 19 Apr 2014
  • c34: CB, 19 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 May 2014