Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johannes Joachim Cardinal Degenhardt

Deceased

Archbishop of Paderborn

Cardinal-Priest of San Liborio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1926BornSchwelm
6 Aug 195226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
12 Mar 196842.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
12 Mar 196842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
1 May 196842.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
15 Mar 197448.1SelectedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
4 Apr 197448.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Apr 197448.2InstalledArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany
21 Feb 200175.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200175.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Liborio
14 Oct 200175.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Liborio
25 Jul 200276.5DiedArchbishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Joachim Degenhardt:
Johannes Joachim Cardinal Degenhardt (born , died ) Archbishop of Paderborn

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
  • a cardinal for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014