Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Consbruch

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Gor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1930BornGütersloh
26 May 195525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
15 Nov 198050.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
15 Nov 198050.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gor
8 Feb 198150.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gor
11 Mar 199968.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
2 Feb 201281.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Consbruch:
Bishop Paul Consbruch (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015