Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hans Leo Drewes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Vina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1922BornDortmund
29 Mar 195230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
29 May 198058.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
29 May 198058.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vina
20 Jul 198058.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vina
26 Apr 199775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
30 Jun 199977.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hans Leo Drewes:
Bishop Hans Leo Drewes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014