Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Liu Jing-he

Deceased

Bishop of Yongping [YŁngping], China

Apostolic Administrator of Chengde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1920Born
4 May 194524.3Ordained PriestPriest
1981²60.0SelectedBishop of Yongping [YŁngping], China
21 Dec 198160.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yongping [YŁngping], China
Aug 1992³71.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chengde, China
8 May 200887.3ConfirmedBishop of Yongping [YŁngping], China
8 Jun 200887.4RetiredBishop of Yongping [YŁngping], China
11 Dec 201392.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Yongping [YŁngping], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Liu Jing-he
Bishop Paul Liu Jing-he (born , died ) Bishop of Yongping [YŁngping]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuanghuagang village/Tangshan, Diocese of Yongping [YŁngping]
Ordained BishopTangshan, Diocese of Yongping [YŁngping]
Death PlaceTangshan, Diocese of Yongping [YŁngping]

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,014, Page 1,144
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,095
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast