Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Lu Zinping (Lu Xinping)

Coadjutor Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1963² Born
24 Oct 198926.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jan 200037.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China
20 Apr 200542.3SucceededBishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Lu Zinping (Lu Xinping)
Bishop Francis Xavier Lu Zinping (Lu Xinping) (born 1963) Coadjutor Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHaimen
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Beijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,672

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast