Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Roch Liu Dian-chi (Li Dianxi)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jilin [Kirin], China


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Oct 1982Ordained BishopBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China
4 Apr 1985DiedBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China

MicroData Summary for Roch Liu Dian-chi (Li Dianxi)
Bishop Roch Liu Dian-chi (Li Dianxi) (died ) Bishop of Jilin [Kirin]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopKirin, Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,098

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast