Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Patrick Powers

Bishop of Superior, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1953 BornBaldwin
20 May 199037.2Ordained PriestPriest of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
15 Dec 201562.8AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
18 Feb 201663.0Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for James Patrick Powers
Bishop James Patrick Powers (born ) Bishop of Superior

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Superior.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 15 Dec 2015
  • c2: CB, 14 Feb 2016
  • c34: CB, 16 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016