Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Louis Tylka

Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Peoria, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1970 Born
18 May 199625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
11 May 202049.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
23 Jul 202050.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Tylka
Father Louis Tylka (born ) Coadjutor Bishop-Elect of Peoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarvey, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopSt. Mary of the Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Peoria, Diocese of Peoria, Illinois

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Peoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 May 2020

Quantcast