Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egon Kapellari

Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1936 Born
9 Jul 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Seckau, Austria
7 Dec 198145.9AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
24 Jan 198246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gurk, Austria
14 Mar 200165.1AppointedBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
22 Apr 200165.2InstalledBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
28 Jan 201579.0RetiredBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Egon Kapellari
Bishop Egon Kapellari (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Graz-Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeoben

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Graz-Seckau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast