Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Krautwaschl

Bishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1963 Born
17 Dec 198926.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Graz-Seckau, Austria
1 Jul 199027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Graz-Seckau, Austria
16 Apr 201552.1AppointedBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria
14 Jun 201552.2Ordained BishopBishop of Graz-Seckau, Austria

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Krautwaschl
Bishop Wilhelm Krautwaschl (born ) Bishop of Graz-Seckau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGleisdorf

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Graz-Seckau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 16 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,508

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 1 Nov 2017