Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kim Ji-seok

Bishop Emeritus of Wonju


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1940 BornWonju
29 Jun 196827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Wonju, Korea (South)
19 Nov 199050.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wonju, Korea (South)
14 Jan 199150.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Wonju, Korea (South)
12 Mar 199352.6SucceededBishop of Wonju, Korea (South)
31 Mar 201675.6RetiredBishop of Wonju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for James Kim Ji-seok
Bishop James Kim Ji-seok (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wonju

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wonju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,390
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 31 Mar 2016