Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Ri Pyung-ho

Bishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1941 BornWanju
15 Dec 196928.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
8 Feb 199048.9AppointedBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)
3 Apr 199049.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Vincent Ri Pyung-ho:
Bishop Vincent Ri Pyung-ho (born ) Bishop of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jeonju {Chonju, Jeon Ju}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,427
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013