Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Chrisostom Kwon Hyok-ju

Bishop of Andong, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1957 Born
26 Jan 198325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Andong, Korea (South)
16 Oct 200144.1AppointedBishop of Andong, Korea (South)
4 Dec 200144.2Ordained BishopBishop of Andong, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for John Chrisostom Kwon Hyok-ju
Bishop John Chrisostom Kwon Hyok-ju (born ) Bishop of Andong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUisong-kun

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Andong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,082
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast