Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Cheong Myong-jo

Deceased

Bishop of Busan {Pusan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1935BornKoje
22 Dec 196227.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 198954.4AppointedBishop of Korea, Military
23 Oct 198954.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubulbaca
13 Feb 199054.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubulbaca
5 Nov 199863.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
28 Aug 199964.3SucceededBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
1 Jun 200772.0DiedBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Augustine Cheong Myong-jo:
Bishop Augustine Cheong Myong-jo (born , died ) Bishop of Busan {Pusan}

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,281
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013