Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John A. Choi Jae-seon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Tanaramusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1912Born
11 Jun 193826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pusan, Korea (South)
26 Jan 195745.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pusan, Korea (South)
26 Jan 195745.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
30 May 195745.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
10 Mar 196250.1AppointedBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
19 Sep 197361.6ResignedBishop of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)
19 Sep 197361.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
3 Jun 200896.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Busan {Pusan}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for John A. Choi Jae-seon
Bishop John A. Choi Jae-seon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Busan {Pusan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUlsan

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast