Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Byeong Hwa Chang

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Masan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1912BornNamsendong
11 Jun 193825.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 196856.1AppointedBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
7 Oct 196856.3Ordained BishopBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
15 Dec 198876.4RetiredBishop of Masan, Korea (South)
3 Aug 199078.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Masan, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Byeong Hwa Chang:
Bishop Joseph Byeong Hwa Chang (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Masan

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013