Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luzizila Kiala

Bishop of Sumbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1963 BornDamba
23 Aug 199228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Uije, Angola
21 May 201349.5AppointedBishop of Sumbe, Angola
25 Aug 201349.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sumbe, Angola
8 Sep 201349.8InstalledBishop of Sumbe, Angola

MicroData Summary for Luzizila Kiala:
Bishop Luzizila Kiala (born ) Bishop of Sumbe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sumbe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2013
  • ob/i: CB, 26 Jun 2013
  • c2: CB, 25 Aug 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013