Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Mary David, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bardstown, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1761BornCouŽron, France
24 Sep 178524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
4 Jul 181756.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
4 Jul 181756.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
15 Aug 181958.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
25 Aug 183271.2SucceededBishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
21 Mar 183472.8ResignedBishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
12 Jul 184180.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Mary David:
Bishop John Baptist Mary David P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bardstown

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 105, and Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013