Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael (Miguel) Domenec, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Allegheny, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1816Born
28 Dec 183418.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
30 Jun 183922.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
28 Sep 186043.7AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Dec 186043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Jan 187659.0AppointedBishop of Allegheny, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Mar 187659.2InstalledBishop of Allegheny, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Jul 187760.5ResignedBishop of Allegheny, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Jan 187861.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Allegheny, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael (Miguel) Domenec (VIAF: 88827708)
Bishop Michael (Miguel) Domenec C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allegheny

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuez, Archdiocese of Tarragona, Spain, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Cathedral, Pittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91, and Page 457
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 168, Number 924
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017