Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Brady

Deceased

Bishop of Perth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1800¹BornCastletara, Ireland
1825²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 184545.3AppointedBishop of Perth, Australia
25 May 184545.3Ordained BishopBishop of Perth, Australia
2 Dec 187171.9DiedBishop of Perth, Australia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Brady (VIAF: 88615001)
Bishop John Brady (born 1800, died ) Bishop of Perth

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,658
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 303
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1845, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016