Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Neeson Lynch

Deceased

Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1817Born
5 Apr 184023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
11 Dec 185740.7AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
14 Mar 185841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
26 Feb 188264.9DiedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Neeson Lynch (VIAF: 81525840)
Bishop Patrick Neeson Lynch (born , died ) Bishop of Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilberidogue, Diocese of Clogher, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopSaint Finbar, Cathedral, Charleston, Diocese of Charleston, South Carolina

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017