Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1803BornCunnareen, Ireland
16 Oct 183128.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 185047.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
19 Jul 185047.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
9 Aug 185047.4SucceededBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
10 Nov 185047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
22 Jan 185652.9DiedBishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Reilly:
Bishop Bernard O’Reilly (born , died ) Bishop of Hartford

  • a priest for 24.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 299, and Page 461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013