Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Hickley Gross, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1837Born
4 Apr 185820.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Mar 186325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
14 Feb 187335.6AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
17 Apr 187335.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
31 Mar 188547.8AppointedArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
14 Nov 189861.4DiedArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for William Hickley Gross (VIAF: 317273814)
Archbishop William Hickley Gross C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Oregon City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 427, and Page 504
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017