Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. John Nepomucene Neumann, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1811Born
25 Jun 183625.2Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
16 Jan 184230.8ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Feb 185240.8AppointedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Mar 185241.0Ordained BishopBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Jan 186048.7DiedBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Oct 1963Beatified
19 Jun 1977Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. John Nepomucene Neumann (VIAF: 88674325)
Bishop St. John Nepomucene Neumann C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Philadelphia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrachatitz, Czech Republic
Ordained BishopSt. Alphonse, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018