Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mathias Clement Lenihan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Great Falls, Montana, USA

Titular Archbishop of Preslavus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1854Born
20 Dec 187925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
20 May 190449.6AppointedBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
21 Sep 190449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
9 Nov 190450.0InstalledBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
14 Feb 193075.3RetiredBishop of Great Falls, Montana, USA
14 Feb 193075.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Preslavus
19 Aug 1943³88.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Great Falls, Montana, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathias Clement Lenihan
Archbishop Mathias Clement Lenihan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Great Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubuque

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast