Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Aloysius Alphonsus McGovern

Deceased

Bishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1872Born
18 Aug 189522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
19 Jan 191239.2AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
11 Apr 191239.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
8 Nov 195179.0DiedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Aloysius Alphonsus McGovern
Bishop Patrick Aloysius Alphonsus McGovern (born , died ) Bishop of Cheyenne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOmaha, Diocese of Omaha, Nebraska

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast