Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Dziemianko

Bishop of Pinsk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1960 BornZabrodzie-Derevno
28 Oct 198020.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 198525.3IncardinatedPriest of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
13 Apr 199131.2IncardinatedPriest of Grodno, Belarus
4 Jul 199838.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grodno, Belarus
4 Jul 199838.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
29 Sep 199838.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
14 Dec 200444.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
14 Jun 200646.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
21 Sep 200747.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
3 May 201252.3AppointedBishop of Pinsk, Belarus
16 Jun 201252.4InstalledBishop of Pinsk, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Antoni Dziemianko:
Bishop Antoni Dziemianko (born ) Bishop of Pinsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,439
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 May 2012
  • i: CB, 4 May 2012
  • opd/inca: CB, 1 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015