Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juozas Preikšas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Panevėžys, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1926Born
23 Sep 195124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
31 Oct 198457.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kaunas, Lithuania
31 Oct 198457.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
31 Oct 198457.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
2 Dec 198458.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
27 Apr 198861.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kaunas, Lithuania
27 Apr 198861.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilkaviškis, Lithuania
2 Apr 198962.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Panevėžys, Lithuania
24 Dec 199165.0AppointedBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania
5 Jan 200275.1RetiredBishop of Panevėžys, Lithuania
11 Feb 201891.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Panevėžys, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Juozas Preikšas (VIAF: 41311680)
Bishop Juozas Preikšas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Panevėžys

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGriškabudis
Death PlaceKaunas, Archdiocese of Kaunas

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast