Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Wielikosielec, O.P.

Auxiliary Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus

Titular Bishop of Blanda Julia

Apostolic Administrator of Minsk-Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1945 Born
3 Jun 198439.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 May 199954.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pinsk, Belarus
6 May 199954.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Blanda Julia
24 Jun 199954.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Blanda Julia
3 Jan 202175.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
23 Oct 202176.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Wielikosielec
Bishop Kazimierz Wielikosielec O.P. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pinsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStarovola
Ordained BishopAssomption, Cathedral, Pinsk, Diocese of Pinsk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pinsk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,572
  • c1: CB, 1 Jul 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast