Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Iosif Staneuski

Archbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1969 Born
8 Dec 199425.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Grodno, Belarus
17 Jun 199526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Grodno, Belarus
29 Nov 201344.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grodno, Belarus
29 Nov 201344.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
1 Feb 201444.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabaicara
14 Sep 202152.4AppointedArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus
23 Oct 202152.5InstalledArchbishop of Minsk-Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Iosif Staneuski
Archbishop Iosif Staneuski (born ) Archbishop of Minsk-Mohilev

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZanievichy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Grodno, Diocese of Grodno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 29 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 13 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,087
  • od/c01: CB, 1 Jul 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2021
  • i: CB, 21 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Sep 2021

Quantcast